Orso v. Lyons et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Referred: | Catherine M Salinas |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03052 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1963 Registration of judgment from another district |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USDC WD North Carolina, 3:14cv00091-GCM |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Todd Disner
|
|
Defendant
Norman Lyons
a member of the Defendant Class of Net Winners in ZeekRewards.com 1937 Cornerstone Pass
Conyers, GA 30012 |
|
Movant
Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew E. Orso
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Writ Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Wed 08/28 9:14 AM
ORDER: The Court APPROVES and ADOPTS the Final Report and Recommendation8 as the Opinion and Order of this Court. It is hereby ORDERED that Nationwide's Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution5 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue the proposed levy and writ of execution for the sale of the Cornerstone Pass Property submitted by Nationwide11 as provided by O.C.G.A. § 9-13-10. The Clerk also is DIRECTED to close this file. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/28/24. (ces) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/28 9:15 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Lyons re13 Order. (ces) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/28 9:19 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ces) |
||
order
Writ Issued
Wed 08/28 9:52 AM
WRIT of Execution for the sale of the Cornerstone Pass Property issued per13 Order. Writ sent to Attorney Eric Joseph Breithaupt via certified mail receipt # 91 7199 9991 7032 5719 1100. (ces) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 07/30 10:24 AM
Submission of8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re5 Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution filed by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respoth
Objections to Report and Recommendation
Thu 07/25 4:09 PM
OBJECTIONS to8 Report and Recommendation filed by Norman Lyons. (dgr) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Application for Writ
Thu 07/18 5:41 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of of Execution and Levy (Proposed) by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Breithaupt, Eric) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/12 11:57 AM
ORDER for Service of8 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 7/12/2024. (dgr) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Fri 07/12 11:55 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the5 Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution be GRANTED and that the objection of Mr. Lyons be OVERRULED. I FURTHER RECOMMEND that Nationwide be DIRECTED to file a proposed levy for execution and sale of the Cornerstone Pass Property for the Clerk to issue and that, upon submission, the Clerk be DIRECTED to issue a levy for the execution and sale of the Cornerstone Pass Property as provided by O.C.G.A. § 9-13-10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 7/12/2024. (dgr) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/12 11:58 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Norman Lyons re8 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and9 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (dgr) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Reply Brief
Fri 07/12 2:52 PM
REPLY BRIEF re5 Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution filed by Norman Lyons. (gww) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 RESPONSE re6 Notice of Filing filed by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc..(Breithaupt, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel Goldberg | ||
utility
Case Reported Statistically
Wed 07/10 11:04 AM
Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:21-mi-34. (dgr) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE Of Filing Objection to Lien by Norman Lyons(bgt) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit - Motion and Article | ||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
Submission of5 Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (rlh) | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Motion for Issuance of Levy and Writ of Execution by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc..(Breithaupt, Eric) Modified on 6/12/2024 to edit text (rlh). | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Assignment of Judgment) (Breithaupt, Eric) | |
Case Reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen and Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:21-mi-34-MHC-CMS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlh) | ||
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Eric Joseph Breithaupt replacing attorney Joseph J. Dinardo. (Breithaupt, Eric) | |
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $113,057.48 as to Norman Lyons. Sent by Certified mail to Joseph J. Dinardo, counsel for plaintiff. Certified mail number 9171999991703257183914. (bdb) | ||
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 APPLICATION for Writ of of Execution by Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Dinardo, Joseph) | |
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment filed by Matthew E. Orso. (Final Judgment is entered against Defendant, Norman Lyons in the amount of $113,057.48. (Attachments: #1 amended Receivership Order Appointing Successor Receiver, #2 Order Granting Motion to Sell Judgments, #3 Assignment of Judgment, #4 Letter to Clerk , #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Modified text on 5/17/2021 (eop). (Entered: 05/14/2021) | |
Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-10975542 (eop) | ||
Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop) |