Russell v. Smith
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00158 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jerri Smith
And All Occupants 193 Pleasant Mountain Drive
Sky Valley, GA 30537 |
|
Plaintiff
R. Bruce Russell, Sr.
P.O. Box 1202
Clayton, GA 30525 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/26 4:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney Fees filed by Jerri Smith. (ddm) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/23 2:54 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jerri Smith re11 Order returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/09 4:11 PM
ORDER ADOPTING the6 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court and REMANDING this civil action to the Magistrate Court of Rabun County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/09/2024. (ddm) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court Attorney Fees
Fri 08/09 3:59 PM
MOTION to Remand and MOTION for Award of Attorney Fees filed by R. Bruce Russell, Sr..(ddm) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/09 4:12 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Clerk's Office of Magistrate Court of Rabun County and to Jerri Smith re11 Order. (ddm) Modified on 8/9/2024 (ddm) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/09 4:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/07 11:30 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked As: RTS Insufficient Address. Mail sent to Jerri Smith re6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rsg) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 07/26 2:25 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jerri Smith re5 Order returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/17 3:55 PM
ORDER for Service of6 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/17/2024. (ddm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Wed 07/17 3:54 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Rabun County. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/17/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 3:55 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to R. Bruce Russell, Sr., Jerri Smith re6 Final Report and Recommendation,7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ddm) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/15 2:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 2:24-CV-158-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/15/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/15 2:38 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to R. Bruce Russell, Sr., Jerri Smith re5 Order. (ddm) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Notice to Pro Se Parties
Thu 07/11 10:22 AM
NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/11/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/11 10:24 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to R. Bruce Russell, Sr., Jerri Smith re4 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (ddm) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 07/10 2:50 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with Jury Demand, by Jerri Smith. (Filed in Magistrate Court of Rabun County on 07/09/2024.)(ddm) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 07/10 2:49 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with Jury Demand, filed by Jerri Smith. Discovery ends on 12/9/2024. (Filed in Magistrate Court of Rabun County on 06/20/2024.)(ddm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/10 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL, with COMPLAINT, filed by Jerri Smith. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 200000322)(ddm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |