Barry v. Warden
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Damon R Leichty |
Referred: | Scott J Frankel |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00552 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/14 3:50 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (nae) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Prisoner E-Service
Thu 07/18 2:40 PM
Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Scott Thomas Barry. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (kmt) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/18 2:45 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the motion to proceed in forma pauperis2 ; GRANTS Scott Thomas Barry until 9/16/2024, to file a motion to stay; and CAUTIONS Scott Thomas Barry that, if he does not respond by this deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/17/2024. (ash) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 12:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Petitioner Scott Thomas Barry. (kmt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
Wed 07/10 11:59 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Scott Thomas Barry.(File stamped copy with case number sent to Barry)(kmt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |