Napier v. Unknown Parties
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00705 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
petitioner
James Norbert Napier Jr.
|
|
respondent
Unknown Parties
|
GPO
Jul 25 2024
ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Tue 08/27 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT by petitioner James Norbert Napier, Jr (mg) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Tue 08/13 11:32 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT by petitioner James Norbert Napier, Jr consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (filed after deadline; no action taken) (mg) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Amended
Mon 08/05 3:42 PM
AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by James Norbert Napier, Jr (ems) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Mon 08/05 9:45 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings (ems) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 08/05 9:47 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)7 sent via U.S. Mail to James Norbert Napier, Jr. (ems) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Wed 07/31 10:05 AM
LETTER from James Norbert Napier, Jr. to Judge (mg) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form
Thu 07/25 9:31 AM
ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 07/25 2:25 PM
Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form5 and amended 2254 form sent via U.S. Mail to James Norbert Napier, Jr. (mg) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Receipt (Habeas)
Fri 07/19 1:39 PM
RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number 100004947 (klb) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Deficiency Order
Wed 07/10 9:50 AM
DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/7/2024 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Wed 07/10 9:25 AM
NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 7/31/2024 (mg) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 07/10 9:27 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)3 sent via U.S. Mail to James Norbert Napier, Jr. (mg) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 07/10 10:42 AM
Copy of Deficiency Order4 sent via U.S. Mail to James Norbert Napier, Jr. (mg) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter to Court
Wed 07/10 9:24 AM
LETTER from petitioner James Norbert Napier, Jr regarding case (mg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 07/10 9:21 AM
PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by James Norbert Napier, Jr (mg) |