CareATC, Inc. v. SET, Inc.
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00710 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:29 AM EDT |
defendant
SET, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
CareATC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/03 11:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SET, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SET, Inc. for SET, Inc. (Mullins, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/03 9:56 AM
ORDER that Defendant/Counter-Claimant file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 08/30 4:48 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against CareATC against SET, Inc. by SET, Inc. (Mullins, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/27 12:29 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lindsay P. Hazen on behalf of defendant SET, Inc. (Hazen, Lindsay) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/06 4:16 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of defendant SET, Inc. (Chapie, Kenneth) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/06 4:17 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Annabel Shea on behalf of defendant SET, Inc. (Shea, Annabel) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/29 2:52 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of defendant SET, Inc. (Mullins, Timothy) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/24 2:00 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; SET, Inc. served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024 (Fultz, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/18 4:38 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel E. Hancock on behalf of plaintiff CareATC, Inc. (Hancock, Daniel) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 10:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant SET, Inc. (ns) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Thu 07/11 10:54 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (ns) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/10 6:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CareATC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CATC AcquisitionCo, Inc. for CareATC, Inc. (Fultz, Benjamin) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Wed 07/10 6:43 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Fultz, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 6:37 PM
COMPLAINT against SET, Inc. filed by CareATC, Inc. (Fultz, Benjamin) |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Wed 07/10 6:41 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff CareATC, Inc. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7423623 (Fultz, Benjamin) |