Worthey #982382 v. Washington et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00111 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2024 |
defendant
Cynthia Partridge
|
|
defendant
Heidi Washington
|
|
defendant
Michigan Parole Board
|
|
defendant
Unknown Owens
|
|
plaintiff
Raydontae T. Worthey #982382
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Mailing
Fri 08/30 9:41 AM
PROOF OF MAILING by plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 re MOTION to amend/correct13 14 (eod) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 08/30 9:28 AM
MOTION to amend/correct13 by plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382; (eod) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 08/27 9:01 AM
MOTION for reconsideration re12 with proof of service by plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382; (eod) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Mon 08/05 2:32 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice; declining to certify that an appeal would not be taken in good faith; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
11 | 11
6
pgs
order
Opinion
Mon 08/05 2:30 PM
OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner
Mon 08/05 2:24 PM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 08/05 3:17 PM
Copy of Opinion11 , Judgment12 and Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner,10 sent via U.S. Mail to Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 (pjw) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter Re Status of Case
Tue 07/30 2:58 PM
LETTER from plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 regarding status of case; (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Response from Clerk | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Tue 07/23 9:51 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat for all further proceedings (eod) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/23 9:53 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)7 sent via U.S. Mail to Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 (eod) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter Requesting Docket Sheet
Tue 07/23 2:57 PM
LETTER from plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 requesting docket sheet; (named as motion) with proof of service; mailed copy of docket sheet on 7/23/2024 (eod) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service
Tue 07/23 9:48 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 re Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)5 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit4 (eod) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Tue 07/23 9:48 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (eod) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Tue 07/23 9:45 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Wed 07/10 8:41 AM
NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 7/31/2024 (eod) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 07/10 8:47 AM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)3 sent via U.S. Mail to Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 (eod) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Wed 07/10 8:41 AM
LETTER from Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 requesting IFP form (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Response from Clerk | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 8:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Michigan Parole Board, Unknown Owens, Cynthia Partridge, Heidi Washington filed by Raydontae T. Worthey #982382 (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons |