Trottier et al v. First Bank of Upper Michigan
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Maarten Vermaat |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00113 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 15:1601 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:29 AM EDT |
defendant
First Bank of Upper Michigan
|
|
plaintiff
Caitlin Trottier
individually and 10884 US Highway 41
Rapid River, MI 49878 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 9:20 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 07/11 3:57 PM
Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge4 , Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis5 sent via U.S. Mail to Caitlin Trottier (eod) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/10 9:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Wed 07/10 3:15 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (jlg) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 07/10 3:17 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Caitlin Trottier (jlg) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 3:14 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Caitlin Trottier; (jlg) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 3:09 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against First Bank of Upper Michigan filed by Caitlin Trottier (jlg) Modified text on 7/10/2024 (jlg) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Durable Power of Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 - Affidavit in Support of Complaint |