Hernandez v. Hidden Hollow Acres 8 et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Georgette Castner |
Referred: | J Brendan Day |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-07689 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
HIDDEN HOLLOW ACRES 8
|
|
Defendant
MATTHEW HOLLOW
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSE HERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/22 11:46 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit Jyll Jakes served on Hidden Hollow on July 16, 2024, filed by JOSE HERNANDEZ. (EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/22 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit Jyll Jakes served on Matthew Hollow on July 16, 2024, filed by JOSE HERNANDEZ. (EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN ALEXANDER EL-HAG on behalf of JOSE HERNANDEZ (EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 9:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to HIDDEN HOLLOW ACRES 8, MATTHEW HOLLOW. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) |
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 07/11 8:44 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |
||
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 07/11 8:44 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . DO NOT select a party if it is not in CAPITAL LETTERS or if it does not reflect the EXACT name as is found in the pleading, Create a new party. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |
||
qc
QC - Fillable PDF
Thu 07/11 8:46 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The2 PROPOSED SUMMONS FOR ISSUE was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Please email a flattened version to ecfhelp@njd.uscourts.gov for replacement on the docket. (jjc, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Thu 07/11 9:17 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kht) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Wed 07/10 6:45 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint,2 Summons - Request for Issue Civil Cover Sheet by Jose Hernandez. (EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons - Request for Issue
Wed 07/10 6:34 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by Jose Hernandez as to All Defendants. (EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/10 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15508161) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jose Hernandez.(EL-HAG, JORDAN) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 9:14 AM
Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day added. (kht) |