Labbe v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Scott L Palk |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00690 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-02628 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Labbe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 09/09 4:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Dawn Goeres on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goeres, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/28 11:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER : The 9/3/2024 Status/Scheduling Conference is STRICKEN. Motions to join due within 30 days of the date of this Order; Motions to amend due within 30 days of the date of this Order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 1/2/2025; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 14 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 1/2/2025; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 1/15/2025; Dft exhibit list due 1/22/2025; Motions in limine due 3/3/2025; Jury instructions due 3/3/2025; Voir dire requests due 3/3/2025; Trial briefs due 3/3/2025; Discovery due by 3/3/2025. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 2/3/2025. Pretrial Report due by 3/3/2025. Entered at the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/28/2024. (llg) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
Tue 08/27 4:46 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Irby, Jerrick) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/05 11:26 AM
ORDER FOR STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE . Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 8/27/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2024 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Scott L. Palk. Entered at the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/5/2024. (llg) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 08/05 9:25 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff. Attorney Ashley H Leavitt withdrawn as counsel for plf. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/5/2024. (llg) |
|
Sunday, August 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Sun 08/04 6:14 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Leavitt, Ashley) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Wed 07/17 5:28 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Irby, Jerrick) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/16 4:03 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor Rose Wewers on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Wewers, Taylor) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/16 4:00 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher J Gnaedig on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Gnaedig, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 07/16 3:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Irby, Jerrick) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/16 3:56 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jerrick L Irby on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Irby, Jerrick) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 2:44 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Koller, A) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 2:39 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley H Leavitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leavitt, Ashley) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 10:23 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Levi Benjamin Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Levi) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/15 10:22 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Wed 07/10 1:52 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4471669. (Irby, Jerrick) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/10 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-2628 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - ROS_Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |