Dover #282720 v. Thornell et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Referred: | Eileen S Willett |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01676 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Judgment
Fri 08/02 2:37 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed August 2, 2024, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is denied. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (EJA) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/02 2:34 PM
ORDER: Petitioner's Petition for Habeas Corpus (Doc.1 ) and this case are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/1/24. (EJA) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/22 3:00 PM
Filing fee PAID IN FULL. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 07/18 9:36 AM
ORDER: Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/17/24.(EJA) |
|
Att: 1 IFP | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Wed 07/10 10:47 AM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Wed 07/10 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (EJA) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/10 10:46 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James J Dover. (2 pages) (EJA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)
Wed 07/10 10:44 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by James J Dover. (10 pages) (EJA) |