(PC)Romo v. Dirkse
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01893 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 11, 2024 7:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Jeff Dirkse
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Romo
1540753 Stanislaus County Public Safety Center 200 E. Hackett Road
Modesto, CA 95358 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/30 11:40 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file court ordered documents re5 Order by Thomas Romo and NOTICE to make court aware of mail delivery is behind. (Lopez, K) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/07 7:36 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order served on Thomas Romo. (Huang, H) |
||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 08/06 1:52 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to SJCJ, 7000 N. Michael Canlis Blvd., Franch Camp, CA 95231 by Thomas Romo. (Murphy, J) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/30 5:33 PM
MAIL RETURNED as NIC,5 Order, sent to Thomas Romo. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/23 12:42 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not in Custody:5 Order sent to Thomas Romo. Notice of Change of Address due by 9/30/2024. (Kyono, V) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/16 11:30 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/16/2024 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Huang, H) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 07/16 11:30 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:5 Order served on Thomas Romo. (Huang, H) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Wed 07/10 12:42 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/12/2024. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/10 12:42 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/10/2024. Old Case Number 1:24-cv-00785-EPG(PC). (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 07/10 12:43 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,3 Order served on Thomas Romo. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Thomas Romo. (Sant Agata, S) | |
1 | 1 (1983)PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jeff Dirkse by Thomas Romo. (Sant Agata, S) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |