Cole v. WH Puppetry
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Darrin P Gayles |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61203 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 8:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Defendant
WH Puppetry
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Merton Cole
3740 NE 6th Avenue
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334 |
GPO
Jul 26 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 07/26 9:49 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 07/26 9:47 AM
[DUPLICATE ENTRY - SEE DE11 FOR IMAGE] ORDER Dismissing Case without prejudice. Closing case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) Modified text on 7/26/2024 (jc) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/18 4:11 PM
MOTION to Discuss Acceptance of Notice of Service and Notice of Suit at Emergency Hearing re8 MOTION for Hearing by Donald Merton Cole. (drz) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Hearing
Thu 07/18 2:26 PM
MOTION for Emergency Hearing by Donald Merton Cole. (drz) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Filing Writ of Mandanmus by Donald Merton Cole. (drz) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Donald Merton Cole to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: donaldmcolejr@aol.com. (wce) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Removal Lower Court to Federal (Letter) by Donald Merton Cole. (wce) | |
4 | 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/9/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 18683 (amb) | |
3 | 3 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Donald Merton Cole (amb) | |
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Request for Emergency Relief) Filing fee $405.00, filed by Donald Merton Cole.(amb) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Pleadings |