Nasheed v. Walmart Inc.
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon D Oliver |
Referred: | S Dave Vatti |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01184 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armani Nasheed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Mon 07/22 9:26 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Samson, J) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 07/19 2:12 PM
ORDER: The plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal13 . Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/19/2024.(Rogers, D) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/18 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Armani Nasheed (O'Brien, Johnpatrick) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 07/11 8:15 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart Inc.,10 Standing Protective Order,8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,11 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
Att: 1 Standing order on removed cases | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Thu 07/11 8:11 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A) |
|
10 | 10
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Thu 07/11 8:10 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/11/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
9 | 9
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 07/11 8:08 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/11/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 07/11 8:07 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2024 Discovery due by 1/10/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2025 Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 2:31 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/24.(Hushin, Z.) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 10:50 AM
NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Civil & Miscellaneous Orders (Dwyer, Renee) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 10:49 AM
NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Standing Orders (Dwyer, Renee) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 10:46 AM
NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Pending Motions (Dwyer, Renee) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 10:44 AM
Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Dwyer, Renee) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV24-6135284-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7830550, filed by Walmart Inc..(Dwyer, Renee) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 3:26 PM
Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.) |
||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/11 3:51 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2024 (Samson, J) |