Clay v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Abizer Zanzi |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00279 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/10 12:03 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/21/2024. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 12/2/2024. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 12/16/2024.Text entry by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 9/10/2024. (shk) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
ss
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 09/09 2:48 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Meyer, Drew) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/09 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Meyer on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Meyer, Drew) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Commencement of SSA Action
Fri 07/12 10:25 AM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 9/10/2024. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (rmf) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/12 10:24 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi added. (rmf) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Davenport Solon on behalf of Raymond S Clay (Solon, Lindsay) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey M Van Gilder on behalf of Raymond S Clay (Van Gilder, Audrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5623409.), filed by Raymond S Clay.(Van Gilder, Audrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |