Fisher v. Mae et al
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine A Crytzer |
Referred: | Jill E Mccook |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00300 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 6:02 AM EDT |
Defendant
British Government
|
|
Defendant
Terasa Mae
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Fisher
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Thu 08/08 3:35 PM
JUDGMENT re 8 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on August 8, 2024. (SAC) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/08 3:28 PM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on August 8, 2024. (SAC) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendations Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 07/19 2:20 PM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint; granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Fisher.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 7/19/2024. (DCB) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information
Thu 07/11 12:56 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/11/2024. TO BE PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFF FISHER AT COUNTER. (MKM) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss
Thu 07/11 12:56 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/11/2024. TO BE PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFF FISHER AT COUNTER. (MKM) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Governing Depositions
Thu 07/11 12:55 PM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 7/11/2024. TO BE PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFF FISHER AT COUNTER. (MKM) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Thu 07/11 12:52 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. TO BE PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFF FISHER AT COUNTER. (MKM) |
|
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)
Thu 07/11 12:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Fisher. (MKM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Fisher. Per page 3 notation, no additional complaint filed. (MKM) |