PICKETT
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | C Ashley Royal |
Referred: | Thomas Q Langstaff |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00229 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/23 12:12 PM
Mail Returned-3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to SHANNON WAYNE PICKETT returned as undeliverable reflecting Released - Death. (ggs) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/23 11:28 AM
Mail Returned-4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, sent to SHANNON WAYNE PICKETT returned as undeliverable reflecting Released - Death. (ggs) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/31 2:08 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $5.33. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 7/31/2024 (TQL) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/24 12:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHANNON WAYNE PICKETT.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by SHANNON WAYNE PICKETT.(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |