DIA v. COLLINS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Kirsch |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-07712 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
NICOLE CERNIGLIARO
28 MOUNTAINVIEW RD.
EWING, NJ 08628 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID A. COLLINS
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
TOUMANE DIA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 08/19 12:08 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/19/2024. (jem) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/14 12:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NICOLE CERNIGLIARO, DAVID A. COLLINS.(BLUMENTHAL, JAMES) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 08/08 12:39 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by TOUMANE DIA against David A. Collins and Nicole Cernigliaro. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
qc
QC - Incorrect Event Selected
Thu 08/08 12:18 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The7 "REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT" filed by MARC SIMON on 8/7/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a "REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK". PLEASE RESUBMIT THE7 "REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT" USING THE EVENT: Civil Events -> Other Filings -> Other Documents -> Request for Clerk's Entry of Default. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mlh) |
||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 08/08 2:54 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DAVID A. COLLINS and NICOLE CERNIGLIARO for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (kht) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Request for Default Judgment by Clerk
Wed 08/07 11:38 AM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by TOUMANE DIA against David A. Collins and Nicole Cernigliaro. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/02 8:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOUMANE DIA. NICOLE CERNIGLIARO served on 7/16/2024, answer due 8/6/2024. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/02 8:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOUMANE DIA. DAVID A. COLLINS served on 7/16/2024, answer due 8/6/2024. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/01 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. CANALE on behalf of TOUMANE DIA (CANALE, ANTHONY) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 3:05 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NICOLE CERNIGLIARO, DAVID A. COLLINS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 3:03 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NICOLE CERNIGLIARO, DAVID D. COLLINS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against NICOLE CERNIGLIARO, DAVID A COLLINS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15510295) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TOUMANE DIA.(SIMON, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET | ||
qc
QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 2:49 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, ) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/11 3:00 PM
Judge Robert Kirsch and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Thu 07/11 3:03 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (kht) |
||
qc
QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff
Thu 07/11 3:06 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Summons Issued attached to docket entry2 filed by the Clerk's office on 7/11/2024 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (kht) |