Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12574

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:24-ap-01153
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc.
Represented By
Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David V. Wadsworth
Represented By
Jonathan Dickey
Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/02 9:34 AM
Adversary Case Number 24-1153 Closed. (jss)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 11/14 2:26 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 24-01153 MER. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 11/27/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Wed 11/13 12:17 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of David V. Wadsworth Related [+]. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 order Abeyance Tue 10/01 2:38 PM
Order Granting Motion to hold this Adversary Proceeding in abeyance pending approval of and performance under the settlement agreement Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 motion Abeyance Mon 09/30 1:28 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 order Extend Time (Adversary) Thu 09/05 3:49 PM
Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Answer due by 10/9/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
7 7 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Wed 09/04 11:47 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO ADVERSARY COMPLAINT Filed by Lacey S. Bryan on behalf of Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc.. (Bryan, Lacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
6 6 order Extend Time (Adversary) Tue 08/06 1:43 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Adversary Complaint Related [+]. Answer due by 9/9/2024. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Motion to Extend Time
Monday, August 05, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 08/05 11:37 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Adversary Complaint Filed by Lacey S. Bryan on behalf of Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc.. (Bryan, Lacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, July 19, 2024
trustee Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee (Use Adversary Case Number) Fri 07/19 3:34 PM
Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee In the Amount of $350.00 for Adversary Proceeding # 24-1153 (Wadsworth, Trustee, David) Modified case number on 7/19/2024 (jac)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
Receipt of Trustee's Payment on Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee([LINK 24-01153 MER] ) [trustee,trfpdap] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32932942. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 07/11 2:42 PM
Summons Service Executed On: July 10, 2024 Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of David V. Wadsworth. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/10 2:43 PM
Summons Issued on Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc. Answer Due 08/9/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Wed 07/10 1:07 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/10 1:05 PM
Adversary case 24-01153 Complaint by David V. Wadsworth against Oldcastle Infrastructure, Inc.. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 10/8/2024 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]