Bugai v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00712 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Grand Traverse County Circuit Court, 24-37089-NO |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:20 AM EDT |
defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Brenda Bugai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Case Management Order
Tue 09/03 8:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 3/3/2025; dispositive motions due by 4/3/2025; settlement conference set for 10/14/2025 at 9:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 11/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 12/1/2025 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Status Report (Rule 16)
Wed 08/28 2:55 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Heidenreich, Julian) Modified text on 8/28/2024 (ems) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 08/01 1:45 PM
DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Brenda Bugai (Stearn, Todd) |
|
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report
Thu 08/01 9:58 AM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 8/29/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/31 4:34 PM
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER to complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Wright, Nicole) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 11:26 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Wright, Nicole) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Attorney Admission Letter
Fri 07/12 3:26 PM
ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Todd J. Stearn; attorney admission deadline set for 8/9/2024; (ems) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Fri 07/12 3:21 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 07/12 3:23 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case2 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Todd J. Stearn (ems) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grand Traverse County Circuit Court case number 2024-37089-NO filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Wright, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, Service of Process Transmittal, Dated June 17, 2024, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, Stipulated Order Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleadings, Dated July 1, 2-24, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, Correspondence to Plaintiff's Attorney Capping Damages, Dated June 27, 2024 and Proposed Stipulated Order Capping Damages, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, Email from Plaintiff's Attorney Declining to Cap Damages, Dated June 27, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Thu 07/11 3:20 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7424585 (Wright, Nicole) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/11 3:41 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Julian Heidenreich on behalf of defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Heidenreich, Julian) |