Marty v. Warden
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Joseph Keith Reeder |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00344 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring MJ Referral for Pretrial and PF&R
Tue 09/03 10:09 AM
CLERK'S ORDER. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, the above-styled civil action is referred to Honorable Joseph Keith Reeder for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/3/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/29 2:29 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing Petitioner, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, to comply with the prior4 Order by paying the $5.00 filing fee or submitting the completed and signed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, and to show good cause for retention of her case on the docket. The Clerk is directed to provide Petitioner with a copy of the prior4 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/29/2024. (cc: Petitioner with copy of4 Order) (arb) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/18 9:10 AM
ORDER directing Petitioner to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 7/18/2024. (cc: Petitioner, w/Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs ) (mk) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Fri 07/12 9:29 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 4:50 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Thu 07/11 4:46 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Heather Marty against Warden, FPC Alderson pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (arb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 07/12 8:38 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |