DOYLE v. BREW'N'MOTION, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Altonaga |
Referred: | Lisette M Reid |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22639 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:0451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
BREW'N'MOTION, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONAN DOYLE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
Thu 09/05 11:15 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 1/28/2025 at 10:00 a.m..(Imler, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 09/05 10:18 AM
ORDER re18 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing and13 Scheduling Order Referring Case to Mediation; on or before 9/6/2024 the parties shall file a corrected notice that schedules a time, date, and place for mediation and attaches a proposed order. The parties shall email the proposed order to the Court in Word format. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
adr
Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
Wed 09/04 7:59 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana as Mediator. (Imler, Jason) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 09/04 2:54 PM
RESPONSE in Support re12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Shotgun Pleading filed by BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. (Saenz, Ruben) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/28 10:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Shotgun Pleading filed by RONAN DOYLE. Replies due by 9/4/2024. (Imler, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/19 2:44 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RONAN DOYLE (Imler, Jason) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/16 5:09 PM
ORDER re5 Order Requiring Certificates of Interested Parties; Plaintiff shall comply with the July 16, 2024 Order August 19, 2024. by 8/19/2024. In his written submission, Plaintiff shall explain why he failed to comply with the July 16, 2024 Order, necessitating this second Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/15 10:20 AM
ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 6/2/2025 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 5/27/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 9/25/2024. All discovery, including expert discovery, due by 2/3/2025. Mediation Deadline 2/10/2025. In Limine Motions due by 3/18/2025. Motions due by 2/18/2025. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/18/2025. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/14 4:47 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Shotgun Pleading by BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2024.(Saenz, Ruben) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Wed 08/14 4:25 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BREW'N'MOTION, LLC (Saenz, Ruben) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 2:27 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BREW'N'MOTION, LLC (Saenz, Ruben) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 08/05 4:40 PM
ORDER granting in part7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. Response/Answer due 8/16/2024. The deadline contained in the July 16, 2024 Order [ECF No.5 ] will not be extended. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/05 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruben Martin Saenz on behalf of BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. Attorney Ruben Martin Saenz added to party BREW'N'MOTION, LLC(pty:dft). (Saenz, Ruben) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 08/05 2:27 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by BREW'N'MOTION, LLC.(Matos, Rosalind) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/05 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosalind J. Matos on behalf of BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. Attorney Rosalind J. Matos added to party BREW'N'MOTION, LLC(pty:dft). (Matos, Rosalind) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Tue 07/16 11:40 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 8/15/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 07/15 2:50 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by RONAN DOYLE. BREW'N'MOTION, LLC served on 7/15/2024, response/answer due 8/5/2024.(Imler, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Executed | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. (wce) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/12 8:17 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT against BREW'N'MOTION, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17671348, filed by RONAN DOYLE.(Imler, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons |