McKay v. Habib et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00928 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 1st JDC-Caddo Parish, 648776-C |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wali Habib
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sizlon L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tangela McKay
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Co
Terminated: 08/01/2024
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order - Doughty/McClusky
Thu 08/15 12:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2025 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Order due by 8/11/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 2/28/2025. Defendants Witness List due by 3/12/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/17/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/1/2025. Discovery deadline 4/1/2025. Expert Depositions due by 5/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2025. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 7/22/2025. Motions in Limine due by 7/18/2025. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 9/5/2025. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/15/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Wed 08/14 1:33 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/14/2024. (crt,Rider, M) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 08/07 9:12 AM
RULE 26(f) Report by Tangela McKay, Sizlon L L C, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co, Wali Habib. (aty,Guidry, Jean-Paul) Modified filers on 8/7/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 08/01 9:46 AM
JUDGMENT granting14 Motion to Dismiss as to Pennsylvania Manufacturer's Association Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/1/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/31 3:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PENNSYLVANIA MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION INSURANCE COMPANY by Tangela McKay. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Guidry, Jean-Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order Proposed order of dismissal | ||
utility
Motions Transferred Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/01 8:10 AM
Motions Transferred regarding14 Motion to Dismiss Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/31/2024. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Group for M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Oubre, Louis) Modified docket text on 7/24/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sizlon, LLC. (aty,Oubre, Louis) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:05 PM
AMENDED DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Sizlon, LLC. (aty,Oubre, Louis) Modified docket text on 7/24/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to Removal Order
Tue 07/23 3:57 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Sizlon, LLC ~ List of Attorneys and Parties in State Court Action ~ . (aty,Hailey, James) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Thu 07/18 2:10 PM
Joint STIPULATION by Wali Habib, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co, Sizlon L L C, Tangela McKay. (aty,Oubre, Louis) Modified on 7/18/2024 to add filer & modify docket text (Miletello, A) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 07/17 4:29 PM
ANSWER to Original Complaint and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Co, Sizlon L L C.(aty,Hailey, James) Modified on 7/17/2024 to add filer and modify docket text (Miletello, A) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/17 2:24 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tangela McKay. (aty,Guidry, Jean-Paul) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Mon 07/15 1:42 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/15/2024. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/12 10:47 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/12/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/12 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to William D Hall on behalf of Tangela McKay. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 7/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/12/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/12 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to James W Hailey, III on behalf of M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Sizlon L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Fri 07/12 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to James W Hailey, III on behalf of Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Sizlon, LLC regarding4 Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement,. Action taken: Terminated Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement deadlines for Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Co & Sizlon L L C. See2 Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 3:30 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Sizlon, LLC. (aty,Hailey, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC-Caddo Parish, Case Number 648776 Division C (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5995961) filed by Sizlon, LLC, Wali Habib, MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney James W Hailey, III added to party Wali Habib(pty:dft), Attorney James W Hailey, III added to party MS Transverse Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney James W Hailey, III added to party Sizlon, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Hailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Record/Pleadings, | ||
Att: 4 Compliance Cert 28 USC §1446(d)-Removal Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet | ||
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/12 10:20 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wali Habib, M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Co, Sizlon L L C filed by Tangela McKay.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Fri 07/12 10:34 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Wali Habib answer due 7/18/2024; M S Transverse Specialty Insurance Co answer due 7/18/2024; Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Co answer due 7/18/2024; Sizlon L L C answer due 7/18/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #3 to1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/12 10:39 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S) |