Martinez v. Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen M Mcnamee |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01709 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Maricopa County Superior Court, CV2024-014222 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 2:20 AM MST |
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant
Wed 07/17 12:15 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Kelley, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/17 12:13 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated.(Kelley, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 07/11 3:18 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23236474. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01709 PHX-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 3:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (submitted by Michael Kelley) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 3:07 PM
NOTICE/ Verification of Notice of Filing by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated re:1 Notice of Removal. (submitted by Michael Kelley) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-014222. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23236474 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (submitted by Michael Kelley)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
***State Court record received on 7/11/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rebecca Martinez: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate upon Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated on 6/11/2024.***Certificate of Service by Private Process Server docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/11/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. | ||
service
Service Executed
Thu 07/11 3:17 PM
***State Court record received on 7/11/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rebecca Martinez: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate upon Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated on 6/11/2024.***Certificate of Service by Private Process Server docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/11/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |