Barberi v. Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22640 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Eureka Service Station, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renzo Barberi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Administrative Order
Wed 08/14 8:03 PM
Order Administratively Closing Case. Status Report or appropriate dismissal documents due on or before September 15, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 08/14 11:42 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/14/2024. Attorney Appearance(s): Ronald E. Stern, Ignacio Urbieta, Todd William Shulby, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5737 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/14 10:18 AM
First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eureka Service Station, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Urbieta Group Investments, LLLP for Eureka Service Station, LLC (Urbieta, Ignacio) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ignacio Urbieta on behalf of Eureka Service Station, LLC. Attorney Ignacio Urbieta added to party Eureka Service Station, LLC(pty:dft). (Urbieta, Ignacio) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Setting Status Conference
Wed 08/07 11:02 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER setting telephonic status conference for Wednesday, August 14, 2024 at 11:00 A.M. The parties are instructed to call +1 305-990-2559 by no later than 10:55 A.M. The phone ID is 481 740 801#. For clarity, the parties shall avoid using speaker phone and call from a landline if possible. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/7/2024. (kgs) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 08/07 10:30 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Defendant Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint. Defendants shall file a combined response or separate answers to the Complaint on or before August 23, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/7/2024. (kgs) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Wed 08/07 8:50 AM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. (Shulby, Todd) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/07 8:50 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. (Shulby, Todd) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Wed 08/07 8:49 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.. (Shulby, Todd) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/07 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd William Shulby on behalf of Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.. Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.(pty:dft). (Shulby, Todd) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 07/22 1:38 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. served on 7/19/2024, response/answer due 8/9/2024. (Stern, Ronald) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/22 9:30 AM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Statement of Renzo Barberi Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 by Renzo Barberi re4 Order (Stern, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Thu 07/18 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order by Ronald E. Stern on behalf of Renzo Barberi (Stern, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 07/17 6:36 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Sua sponte review of the record indicates that Plaintiff filed a Complaint on July 11, 2024,1 . Plaintiff served Defendant Eureka Service Station LLC on July 15, 2024. See Proof of Service,5 . However, no Proof of Service has been filed for Defendant Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. Accordingly, to better manage the orderly progress of this case, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Further, for clarity of the record, Plaintiff shall promptly file Proof of Service on the public docket for Defendant Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp. as soon as it becomes available. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/17/2024. (kgs) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 07/17 11:52 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Renzo Barberi. Eureka Service Station, LLC served on 7/15/2024, response/answer due 8/5/2024. (Stern, Ronald) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 07/12 6:14 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT. Certificate and Affidavit due on or before July 24, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (kgs) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Eureka Service Station, LLC, Inaoly Auto Tech. Corp.. (pc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/12 10:27 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17671410, filed by Renzo Barberi.(Stern, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) |