Wright v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph S Van Bokkelen |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00562 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Commencement of SSA Action
Mon 07/15 12:30 PM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 9/13/2024. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (lns) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 12:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Lashonda J Wright; WAIVING payment of the filing fee; and DIRECTING the clerk to docket a Notice of Commencement of SSA Action. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/15/2024. (lns) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/12 12:53 PM
**NEW CASE** MOTION PENDING** Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. (nae) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ann E Young on behalf of Lashonda J. Wright (Young, Ann) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Lashonda J. Wright (Rodman, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/11 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Lashonda J. Wright (Forbes, Randal) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 5:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lashonda J. Wright. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lashonda J. Wright.(Forbes, Randal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |