Houghtaling Law Firm, LLC v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Shelly D Dick |
Referred: | Richard L Bourgeois, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00562 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge, C-748858 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Houghtaling Law Firm, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/08 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Meyer, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion(s) Referred
Fri 07/19 10:08 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/19 5:15 PM
ORDER granting7 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is granted an extension of time until 8/8/2024 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/19/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/18 9:33 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Meyer, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
order
90 Day Conference Order
Thu 07/18 6:38 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 9/26/2024 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 9/12/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/18/2024. (SGO) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 07/16 12:14 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Wells Fargo & Company, Affiliate/Interested Person Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Affiliate/Interested Person Houghtaling Law Firm, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Stephen M. Huber, Affiliate/Interested Person Logan E. Schonekas, Affiliate/Interested Person Christopher T. Whelan, Affiliate/Interested Person Christopher D. Meyer, Affiliate/Interested Person WFC Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Meyer, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 11:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings, LLC for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Meyer, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 07/16 11:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Wells Fargo & Company, Affiliate/Interested Person Houghtaling Law Firm, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Stephen M. Huber, Affiliate/Interested Person Logan E. Schonekas, Affiliate/Interested Person Christopher T. Whelan, Affiliate/Interested Person Wells Fargo Bank,N.A., Affiliate/Interested Person Christopher D. Meyer for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Meyer, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency with LR 7.1
Mon 07/15 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First)
Thu 07/11 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-748858. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2775567), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Meyer, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet |