HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC v. ECMOHO (Hong Kong) Limited
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John P Cronan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05258 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
ECMOHO (Hong Kong) Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
Haleon US Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/06 2:48 PM
MOTION for Stephen J. Kastenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29855905. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Haleon US Holdings LLC..(Kastenberg, Stephen) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/06 2:44 PM
MOTION for Emilia McKee Vassallo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29855834. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Haleon US Holdings LLC..(McKee Vassallo, Emilia) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 09/06 3:15 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 9 MOTION for Emilia McKee Vassallo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29855834. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 09/06 3:18 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 MOTION for Stephen J. Kastenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29855905. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/22 11:37 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting7 MOTION for Marguerite Agnes OBrien to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT This request is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Marguerite A. O'Brien as counsel in this case, and close Docket Number 7. SO ORDERED. Attorney Marguerite Agnes O'Brien terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/22/2024) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/20 1:49 PM
MOTION for Marguerite Agnes OBrien to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Haleon US Holdings LLC..(O'Brien, Marguerite) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ana Maria Blanco on behalf of Haleon US Holdings LLC..(Blanco, Ana) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 11:11 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ECMOHO (Hong Kong) Limited..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 07/12 11:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marguerite Agnes O'Brien. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 07/12 11:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 07/12 11:10 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 07/12 11:10 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 07/11 6:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ECMOHO (Hong Kong) Limited, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC..(O'Brien, Marguerite) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/11 6:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Haleon US Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Haleon UK Holdings (No. 2) Limited, Other Affiliate Haleon UK Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Haleon Intermediate Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Haleon plc for HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC. Document filed by HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC..(O'Brien, Marguerite) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 07/11 6:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Brien, Marguerite) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT against ECMOHO (Hong Kong) Limited. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29593863)Document filed by HALEON US HOLDINGS LLC..(O'Brien, Marguerite) |