Scott v. City of Albuquerque et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Referred: | John F Robbenhaar |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00710 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 3:37 AM MDT |
Defendant
City of Albuquerque
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Max Denerstein
|
|
Defendant
George Martinez
|
|
Plaintiff
Theodore Scott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Max Denerstein, George Martinez, City of Albuquerque as to Max Denerstein, George Martinez. (Dalton, Kristin) | |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Albuquerque. (Dalton, Kristin) | |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Agreed Upon Extension to File Responsive Pleading (Dalton, Kristin) | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Theodore Scott voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ayala, Shavon) | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) | ||
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 1005238 re1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from State of New Mexico Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2024-04490. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque.(Dalton, Kristin) filed by City of Albuquerque (bp) | ||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque re1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Dalton, Kristin) | |
2 | 2 Transmittal of State Court Documents by City of Albuquerque (Dalton, Kristin) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified State Court Record | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Albuquerque from State of New Mexico Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2024-04490. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by City of Albuquerque.(Dalton, Kristin) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |