Rambow v. Harmon Law Offices
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Steven J Mcauliffe |
Referred: | Andrea K Johnstone |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00204 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Harmon Law Offices
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie A. Rambow
238 North Main St
Concord, NH 03301 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/09 3:56 PM
ORDER re 1 Complaint. The court orders the three cases (24-cv-202-SE-AJ, 24-cv-203-LM-TSM, 24-cv-204-SM-AJ) to be consolidated for pretrial purposes, as outlined. The clerk's office must administratively close the two excess cases, leaving open the consolidated case, Rambow v. Harmon et al., No. 24-cv-202-SE-AJ (D.N.H.). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(ko) |
|
notice
Administrative Closing
Mon 08/12 2:18 PM
Notice of Administrative Closing. This case has been administratively closed per 8/7/2024 Order.(lw) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response - not to Motion
Fri 08/02 4:40 PM
RESPONSE/Objection re3 Order filed by Julie A. Rambow. (de) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/23 8:43 AM
ORDER re: 1 Complaint. Unless any party objects in writing within fourteen days of the date of this Order, the clerk's office will consolidate the three cases identified in the caption of this Order into the oldest open case filed by the plaintiff, Rambow v. Harmon, No. 24-cv-202-SE-AJ (D.N.H.). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Objections to Consolidation due 8/5/2024.(lw) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Fri 07/12 11:46 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(ed) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 07/11 10:58 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
Thu 07/11 10:49 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Julie A. Rambow.(ed) |
|
1 | 1
2
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 10:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Harmon Law Offices with Jury Demand filed by Julie A. Rambow.(ed) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 07/11 10:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-204-SM-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) |