Alger v. Campbell et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan K Declercq |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11771 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2024 |
Defendant
B. Porter
|
|
Defendant
Brockway
|
|
Defendant
Deroke
|
|
Defendant
Holman
|
|
Defendant
K. Roark
|
|
Defendant
L. McRoberts
|
|
Defendant
S. Campbell
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Levi Alger Sr.
|
GPO
Aug 09 2024
Opinion and Order Dismissing Complaint Sua Sponte for Failure to Prosecute and Denying Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer) |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Change of Address/Contact Information
Wed 09/11 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. (JHea) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/06 11:22 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. re7 Opinion and Order Dismissing Case (JHea) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Change of Address/Contact Information
Tue 08/20 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. (JHea) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment*
Fri 08/09 1:29 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer) |
|
7 | 7
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 08/09 1:28 PM
Opinion and Order Dismissing Complaint Sua Sponte for Failure to Prosecute and Denying Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/09 1:29 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Judgment,7 Order Dismissing Case on Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. 376096 GUS HARRISON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 2727 E. BEECHER STREET ADRIAN, MI 49221 (LVer) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 07/31 11:30 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. (TTho) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Correct Deficiency - Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only
Thu 07/18 2:22 PM
ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 8/2/2024 . Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/18 2:24 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order to Correct Deficiency (Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only) on Joshua Levi Alger, Sr 376096 GUS HARRISON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 2727 E. BEECHER STREET ADRIAN, MI 49221 (LVer) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Fri 07/12 8:25 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SHic) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Mediation Program*
Thu 07/11 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (TTho) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Thu 07/11 11:03 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Joshua Levi Alger, Sr. (TTho) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Thu 07/11 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Levi Alger, Sr against All Defendants (TTho) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |