Shaik
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurie J Michelson |
Referred: | Kimberly G Altman |
Case #: | 2:24-mc-50832 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 09/04 3:18 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Abdul Jameer Shaik re6 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (JHea) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/23 12:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Abdul Jameer Shaik re2 Order (JHea) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/15 8:27 AM
ORDER TO VERIFY INTENDED JURISDICTION. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/15 8:28 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 ORDER TO VERIFY INTENDED JURISDICTION on Abdul Jameer Shaik at General Delivery, Minneapolis, MN 55440. (EPar) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Tue 08/13 9:28 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (ABun) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Mon 08/12 4:05 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Abdul Jameer Shaik. (JHea) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
Mon 08/12 4:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Abdul Jameer Shaik against Laura Finnegan, Ryan Anderson, John Doe, Kelly Lolmstead, Treye D. Kettwick. (JHea) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Wed 08/07 3:44 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court STRIKES ECF No.3 Affidavit filed by Abdul Jameer Shaik for failure to comply with E.D. Mich. LR 5.1 and 7.1. Issued by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) |
||
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/07 3:46 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order Striking on Abdul Jameer Shaik at General Delivery, Minneapolis, MN 55440. (EPar) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Tue 08/06 5:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Abdul Jameer Shaik by Abdul Jameer Shaik [Submitted via Pro Se Upload] (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 9:06 AM
ORDER to Amend Complaint and Correct Filing Fee Deficiency. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/16 9:11 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re2 Order on Abdul Jameer Shaik at General Delivery, Minneapolis, MN 55440. (EPar) |
||
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misccs
Misc. Case - Initiating Document, Other
Thu 07/11 1:41 PM
DOCUMENT filed by Abdul Jameer Shaik, Receipt No: 150011209 - Fee: $52 dollars. (TTho) |
|
Att: 1 Document Continuation |