ALLEN V. GBI et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc T Treadwell |
Referred: | Amelia G Helmick |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00223 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Defendant
GBI
|
|
Defendant
INTERNAL AFFAIRS
|
|
Defendant
JOE WILLIAMS
|
|
Defendant
MOODY
|
|
Defendant
WALKER
|
|
Defendant
WILEY
|
|
Plaintiff
DENVER F ALLEN
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/22 1:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DENVER F. ALLEN. Motion referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Amelia G. Helmick (tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement - Incomplete | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Recast Complaint/Petition
Thu 08/22 1:23 PM
RECAST1 Complaint against GBI, INTERNAL AFFAIRS, MOODY, WALKER, WILEY, JOE WILLIAMS by DENVER F ALLEN (tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order to File Prisoner Account Statement Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint
Thu 08/08 1:51 PM
ORDER to pay the filing fee or submit a proper motion to proceed IFP. ORDER to Recast Complaint. The Clerk is directed to forward to Plaintiff the appropriate forms. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMELIA G HELMICK on 8/8/2024. (mlb) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 3:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT against GBI, INTERNAL AFFAIRS, JOE WILLIAMS, WILEY, MOODY, WALKER, filed by DENVER F ALLEN.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope GAND |