FB Birch Run, LLC v. Jeffreys
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03054 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Michael Jeffreys
and All Other Occupants 1506 Summerwood Drive
Clarkston, GA 30021 |
|
Plaintiff
FB Birch Run, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Remark
Fri 08/02 8:48 AM
Case electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of DeKalb County re5 Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically. Filing status: Submitted. (jkb) |
|
Att: 1 Email Confirmation | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 08/02 2:19 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jeffreys re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jkb) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Fri 08/02 8:27 AM
ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation. This case is remanded to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 08/01/2024. (jkb) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/02 8:29 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkb) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/12 11:20 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation,, Order ruling on IFP, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/12/2024. (jkb) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP
Fri 07/12 11:17 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Michael Jeffreys. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. ORDER GRANTING1 In Forma Pauperis solely for the limited purpose of determining whether this action has been properly removed to this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/12/2024. (jkb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Michael Jeffreys.(jkb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/12 11:18 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Jeffreys re3 Final Report and Recommendation, Order ruling on IFP and re4 ORDER for Service of Final Report and Recommendation (jkb) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 12:49 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (tht) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 12:41 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jeffreys.(tht) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |