Kajunju v. Krispy Kreme
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Boulee |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03056 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (National Origin) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Krispy Kreme
|
|
Plaintiff
Sifa Inchi Kajunju
9995 Old Dogwood Road
Roswell, GA 30076 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/29 2:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-3056-JPB-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2024. (dob) |
|
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 2:40 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dob) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Sifa Inchi Kajunju re2 Order Reassigning Case. (dob) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/11 2:30 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jbu) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 2:29 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sifa Inchi Kajunju.(jbu) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |