Bray v. Sejong Georgia, LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | Russell G Vineyard |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00129 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 6:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sejong Georgia, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Notorris Bray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Mon 08/26 2:41 PM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 08/26/2024. (jkb) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP
Fri 08/23 11:23 AM
Clerk's Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/21 4:01 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sejong Georgia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SJG America, Inc., Corporate Parent SJG Sejong Co., Ltd for Sejong Georgia, LLC. (Gumbel, Jon) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/21 3:52 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Sejong Georgia, LLC. Discovery ends on 1/21/2025.(Gumbel, Jon) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/09 2:31 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Sejong Georgia, LLC Answer due 8/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/9/2024. (dmb) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/06 2:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re:1 Complaint, by Sejong Georgia, LLC.(Gumbel, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 08/02 10:34 AM
Return of Service Executed by Notorris Bray. Sejong Georgia, LLC served on 7/12/2024, answer due 8/2/2024. (Gilb, Ricardo) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 07/11 8:57 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Sejong Georgia, LLC. (dmb) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 8:57 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13563378) filed by Notorris Bray.(dmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |