Eberhart v. Officer et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Sherri A Lydon |
Referred: | Paige J Gossett |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03896 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 09/04 10:12 AM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED13 Proper Form Order, Financial Certificate, Summons, and two Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerk's Office to Nevelle Joshua Eberhart 363531, Lee County F2-A-1124, 990 Wisacky Hwy., Bishopville, SC 29010. (ahil) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Proper Form Order
Wed 09/04 10:02 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 9/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on September 3, 2024. (ahil) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 08/01 12:06 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED8 Proper Form Order, Financial Certificate, one summons form, two USM 285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Nevelle Joshua Eberhart 363531 Lee County F2-A-1124 990 Wisacky Hwy Bishopville, SC 29010. (apsn) |
|
8 | 8
order
Proper Form Order
Thu 08/01 12:04 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 08/01/2024. (apsn) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
True Division for Trial
Thu 07/11 2:16 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (apsn) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 2:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nevelle Joshua Eberhart. Response to Motion due by 7/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/11 2:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Columbia Police Department, Police Officer, filed by Nevelle Joshua Eberhart.(apsn) |
|
Att: 1 Stamped File Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |