Ellison v. Sunshine House Inc, The
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Cameron Mcgowan Currie |
Referred: | Kaymani D West |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03898 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Public Accommodations) |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Richland County Common Pleas, 2024-CP-40-03403 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 7:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sunshine House Inc, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shayla Ellison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 08/22 2:53 PM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Shayla Ellison.(Millender, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 08/19 12:40 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Sunshine House Inc, The.(Dickey, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/19 10:59 AM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/12/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/10/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/10/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/10/2025, Discovery due by 3/14/2025, Motions due by 5/28/2025, ADR Statement due by 3/14/2025, Mediation Due by 4/14/2025, Rule 56 Conference Deadline 5/5/2025. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial the later of 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or on or after July 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/19/2024. (prou, ) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 08/19 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Nicholas Quartraro to withdraw as counsel, ECF No. 9 , is granted. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Elizabeth Salley Millender of Cromer Babb & Porter, LLC. The Clerk is to so note on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 8/19/2024.(prou, ) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 08/16 2:06 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Sunshine House Inc, The.(Dickey, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed) Consent Amended Scheduling Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 08/16 1:34 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Shayla Ellison. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(Quatraro, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/18 3:40 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/7/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/21/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 8/21/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/11/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/11/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/12/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/12/2024, Discovery due by 1/13/2025, Motions due by 3/26/2025, ADR Statement due by 1/13/2025, Mediation Due by 2/12/2025, Rule 56 Conference Deadline 3/5/2025. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial the later of 60 days after dispositive motions have been resolved or on or after May 13, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/18/2024. (prou, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 3:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sunshine House Inc, The.(Dickey, Joseph). Modified on 7/17/2024 to correct event type. (prou, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Ellison New Hire Docs-Redacted, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Job Description For Assistant Teacher, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Ellison Employment Application-Redacted | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal
Tue 07/16 3:25 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Richland County.(Dickey, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Removal | ||
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 07/16 10:23 AM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shayla Ellison.(Millender, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 07/11 9:51 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sunshine House Inc, The.(prou, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Richland County Common Pleas, case number 2024-CP 40-03403 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11868201), filed by Sunshine House Inc, The.(prou, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings |