Brown v. Warden Martell
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-03879 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 08/01 11:19 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED11 Judgment,10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Wilbert Evans Brown, Jr #378348, MacDougall Correctional Institution, Cypress Two, 1516 Old Gillard Road, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (rweb, ) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Judgment
Thu 08/01 11:17 AM
JUDGMENT. The petition is dismissed. (rweb, ) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order Ruling on Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/01 11:11 AM
ORDER ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court adopts and incorporates the Magistrate Judge's Report (ECF No. 8 ) and dismisses this action without requiring Respondent to file an answer or return. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/1/24. (rweb, ) Modified on 8/1/2024 to edit text (rweb, ) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 07/12 2:54 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Wilbert Evans Brown, Jr, 7 Text Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,6 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Wilbert Evans Brown, Jr #378348, MacDougall Correctional Institution, Cypress Two, 1516 Old Gillard Road, Ridgeville, SC 29472. (rweb, ) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/12 2:53 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is recommended that this action be dismissed without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 7/12/24. (rweb, ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/12 2:51 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 7/12/24.(rweb, ) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer
Fri 07/12 2:50 PM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 7/12/24.(rweb, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
True Division for Trial
Thu 07/11 12:05 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (rweb, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/11 12:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wilbert Evans Brown, Jr. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(rweb, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 or 2241
Thu 07/11 12:04 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Wilbert Evans Brown, Jr.(rweb, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |