Douglas v. Lopez et al
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Debra M Brown |
Referred: | Roy Percy |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00200 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Doe Entities N-Z
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Persons A-M
|
|
Defendant
Janeim Calderon Lopez
|
|
Defendant
Pilot Travel Centers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Schneider National Carrier, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cory Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint - State Court
Mon 08/26 2:30 PM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Janeim Calderon Lopez. (Dunbar, David) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/23 11:42 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/23/24. (rrh) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/22 12:49 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Janeim Calderon Lopez (corrected from 8/20/2024 filing) by Cory Douglas. (Barlow, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Las Vegas Process Server Email, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Accurint Report Request Email, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 1st Process Server in McKinney, TX Emails of Attempted Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Envelope for SOP via Certified Mail in McKinney, TX, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Returned Envelope for SOP via Certified Mail in McKinney, TX, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 2nd Process Server in McKinney, TX Email of Attempted SOP, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - St. Joseph, MO Process Server Emails of Attempted SOP, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Envelope for SOP via Certified Mail to St. Joseph, MO, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - MS SOS Letter re SOP via Certified Mail to St. Joseph, MO filed in state court case [MEC 13] | ||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/21 1:50 PM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/21/24. (rtc) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Conference
Wed 08/21 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 08/20 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Grant M. Tarleton on behalf of Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Tarleton, Grant) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Trial
Tue 08/20 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 8/18/2025 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (lld) |
|
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/20 11:54 AM
ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/20/24. (rtc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Case Management Order
Tue 08/20 11:53 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 2/20/2025. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/20/2024. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/20/2024. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/20/2024. Motions due by 3/13/2025. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2025 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/20/24. (rtc) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 08/20 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2024. (rtc) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 08/20 9:54 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Janeim Calderon Lopez by Cory Douglas. (Barlow, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I | ||
notice
Notice of Correction
Tue 08/20 3:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Janeim Calderon Lopez : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and Administrative Procedures Section III(A)(8) states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney directed to refile. Motion has been terminated. (lgm) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/19 11:59 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Robert G. Barlow, III on behalf of Cory Douglas to All Defendants. (Barlow, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 08/19 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by David C. Dunbar on behalf of Schneider National Carrier, Inc.. (Dunbar, David) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint - State Court
Thu 07/25 11:13 AM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (Kidd, D.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
21
pgs
misc
Memorandum in Support
Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Certain Claims filed by Schneider National Carrier, Inc.. (Dunbar, David) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 07/23 3:37 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Certain Claims by Schneider National Carrier, Inc.. (Dunbar, David) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 07/18 4:26 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/18/24. (rrh) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 07/15 7:56 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery - Responses to Requests for Admission by Robert G. Barlow, III on behalf of Cory Douglas to Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Barlow, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/15 7:49 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Janeim Calderon Lopez by Cory Douglas. (Barlow, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order - Rule 16.1
Mon 07/15 3:30 PM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/15/24. (rtc) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint - State Court
Thu 07/11 10:39 AM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Schneider National Carrier, Inc.; filed in state court, see doc4 . (jla) |
|
4 | 4
notice
State Court Record - Removal
Thu 07/11 10:31 AM
STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Kidd, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons - Janeim Lopez, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons - Pilot Travel Centers, LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Summons - Schneider National, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Schneider National Carrier's Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - Matthew Rutherford, Jr., | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Schneider National's NOS of Discovery to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Plaintiff's NOS of Discovery to Schneider National, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - Schneider National, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - Pilot Travel Centers, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Pilot Travel Center's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/11 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Case Filing as to Robert G. Barlow, III (jla) |
|
notice
Notice of Assignment
Thu 07/11 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint - State Court
Thu 07/11 10:10 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Doe Entities N-Z, John Doe Persons A-M, Janeim Calderon Lopez, Pilot Travel Centers LLC, Schneider National Carrier, Inc., filed by Cory Douglas. (jla) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/11 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pilot Travel Centers LLC from Union County Circuit Court, case number 73CI1:24-cv-139-JKL. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSNDC-2411474) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally. , filed by Pilot Travel Centers LLC. (jla) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |