(PC) Bonilla v. Clay
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Mendez |
Referred: | Chi Soo Kim |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01898 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Defendant
Clarence Don Clay
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT
|
GPO
Jul 23 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2024 DISMISSING this case. No further documents will be accepted in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Kyono, V) |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Tue 07/23 11:51 AM
JUDGMENT dated *7/23/2024* pursuant to order signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2024. (Kyono, V) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 07/23 11:50 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2024 DISMISSING this case. No further documents will be accepted in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Kyono, V) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 07/23 11:52 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Order and3 Judgment served on Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Kyono, V) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
misc
IFP Application
Thu 07/11 9:54 AM
LODGED COMPLAINT filed by Vexatious Litigant - Court Action Required. (Murphy, J) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Thu 07/11 9:53 AM
LODGED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Clarence Don Clay by Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Murphy, J) |