Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00044
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 12, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Denardo A McCormack (1)
Represented By
David E Vandercoy - FCD
Federal Community Defenders Inc - Sb/in
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jerome W McKeever AUSA
Us Attorney'S Office - Sb/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/12/2024 4:08 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Denardo A McCormack (1). (jld) (jld). [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/3/2024) Restricted Ink Signature
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
Arrest of Denardo A McCormack (slm) [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Denardo A McCormack. Initial Appearance (ZOOM) set for 7/8/2024 03:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm) [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David E Vandercoy - FCD appearing for Denardo A McCormack (Vandercoy - FCD, David) [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
5 5 Defendant's Consent to Appear by Video Teleconference as to Denardo A McCormack. (slm) (nae). [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/9/2024) Corrected Main Document
6 6 INITIAL APPEARANCE /PRELIMINARY EXAM as to Denardo A McCormack held on 7/8/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr via video teleconference. Govt appeared by atty McKeever. Dft appeared by atty Vandercoy. Colanese appeared on behalf of U S Pretrial Services. Defendant advised of rights, charges and penalties. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. Court finds defendant is eligible for court appointed counsel. Parties stipulate to probable cause and waive full hearing. This matter is bound over for further proceedings before the district court. In Court Detention Hearing set for 7/12/2024 02:00 PM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. Defendant REMANDED to custody of US Marshal.(Tape #FTR 7/8/24.) (slm) [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
7 7 PRETRIAL BOND REPORT as to Denardo A McCormack . NOTE: This document will only be accessible to appropriate court staff, the government attorney and the attorney for the applicable defendant. Other defendants in the case and the general public will NOT be able to view this document. For parties entitled to a free look at this document, enter your CM/ECF login and password to confirm your right to view this document. (USPO Bucha - aaron_bucha@innp.uscourts.gov, fax 574-246-8351) [3:24-mj-00053-MGG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT as to Denardo A McCormack (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (eeb) (eeb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/11/2024) Restricted Ink Signature
9 9 BILL OF PARTICULARS FOR FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY by United States of America as to Denardo A McCormack (eeb)
Related: [-]