Beres et al v. Menard, Inc.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Holly A Brady |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00282 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allen County Superior Court No. 3, 02D03-2406-CT-000404 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Menard Inc
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Erik Chickedantz
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Beres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Beres
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/13 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 11/12/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/12/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 07/12/2025; and from Defendant by 08/12/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 12/12/2024; as to Defendant is 01/12/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 06/12/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 08/13/2024. (jdb) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Tue 08/13 10:17 AM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/13/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Carolyn Trier. Dft appeared by atty Zachary Raibley. Court addresses the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. Atty Trier advises Plaintiff's settlement demand was in excess of the $75,000 threshold. The14 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as mediator. Atty Trier to notify mediator by letter, copy to atty Raibley. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/3/2024. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) Modified on 8/13/2024 to add text (mr) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Wed 08/07 3:46 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trier, Carolyn) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Thu 07/18 1:48 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Thu 07/18 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/17 9:00 AM
***Corporate Disclosure Deadline terminated. (kmt) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 07/16 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Steven Beres, Susan Beres -- Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement. (Trier, Carolyn) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/16 12:17 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plaintiffs are ordered to file disclosure statements in compliance with FRCP 7.1(a)(2) by 7/23/2024. Text entry order. (mr) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 9:50 AM
Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards' ANSWER to Complaint by Menard Inc.(Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn M Trier on behalf of Steven Beres, Susan Beres (Trier, Carolyn) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/15 11:26 AM
**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C Raibley on behalf of Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards (Raibley, Zachary) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 07/12 8:27 AM
NOTICE by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards of Filing in State Court (Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/12 8:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards. (Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/12 8:24 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards. (Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 8:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N Hamilton on behalf of Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards (Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 8:18 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5624282.) from Allen County Superior Court No. 3, Cause No. 02D03-2406-CT-000404, filed by Menard, Inc. d/b/a Menards.(Hamilton, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Documents including Court Docket; Complaint with Summons; Summons Menard, Inc.; Appearance Carolyn Trier; Certificate of Issuance of Summons; Order Setting CMC for 9-17-24; Return of Service of Summons; 07 Appearance Jessica Hamilton; 08 Appearance Zachary Raibley; Defendant's MET to Answer Complaint; Order granting MET to Answer Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint with Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, June 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
State Court Complaint
Mon 07/15 11:46 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Menard Inc, filed by Susan Beres, Steven Beres filed in Allen County Superior Court case 02D03-2406-CT-000404.(nae) |