Eaves v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03693 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 09/05 6:46 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due by 10/21/2024. (art) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Wed 09/04 1:05 PM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 10/21/2024. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 002 Court Transcript Index 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 5 006 Non Disability Related Development 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 6 007 Disability Related Development 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 7 008 Medical Records 11 15-2022 | ||
Att: 8 009 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 9 010 Payment Documents and Decisions 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 10 011 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 11 012 Non Disability Related Development 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 12 013 Disability Related Development 07 29-2024 | ||
Att: 13 014 Medical Records 07-29-2024 | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
notice
(SSA 3) Clerk's Final Notice Re: General Order 22-04
Tue 07/23 9:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to[LINK:S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04] , there is no unanimous consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to randomly assign this case to a resident District Judge. (jmb) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/23 9:49 AM
Judge James L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz added. (jmb) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 7:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael A. Eaves. (bjc) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 7:53 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - In accordance with Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within SIXTY (60) DAYS after filing of the Social Security Identification Form and the Complaint as required by Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1(a), which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Statement of Errors within FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiffs Reply, if any, must be filed FIFTEEN (15) DAYS after the memorandum in opposition is filed. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 07/13/2024. (bjc) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/15 8:02 AM
Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 9/13/2024. (bjc) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
(SSA 2) Statement As To MJ Jurisdiction Form
Fri 07/12 10:16 AM
Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the Clerk Walter H. Rice Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse Room 712 Attn: Social Security Coordinator 200 W. Second Street Dayton, Ohio 45402 DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov . The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 8/12/2024 (mas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
(SSA 1) Clerk's Notice Re: General Order 22-04
Fri 07/12 10:13 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to[LINK:S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04] , if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (mas) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/12 9:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael A. Eaves. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint |