Singleton v. McKee
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Damon R Leichty |
Referred: | Scott J Frankel |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Patrick McKee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Singleton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/09 3:20 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Patrick McKee.(Christman, Katlyn) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/14 2:06 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/25 1:48 PM
Reset Deadlines: Answer due date reset to 9/9/2024 per7 Agreed Notice. (jld) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Knight on behalf of Patrick McKee (Knight, Elizabeth) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/24 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Patrick McKee of Automatic Initial Extension (Christman, Katlyn) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katlyn M Christman on behalf of Patrick McKee (Christman, Katlyn) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/23 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Singleton. Patrick McKee served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Falk, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Starke County Deputy Sheriff Patrick McKee. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ash) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/15 9:30 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (ash) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stevie J Pactor on behalf of Jeremy Singleton (Pactor, Stevie) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Falk on behalf of Jeremy Singleton (Falk, Kenneth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Starke County Deputy Sheriff Patrick McKee( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5624482.), filed by Jeremy Singleton.(Falk, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |