Fortis Energy Services, Inc v. Huntington National Bank
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J White |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11807 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oakland County Circuit Court, 24-206451-CB |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Huntington Bancshares, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Huntington National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fortis Energy Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Appear*
Wed 08/28 1:27 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 2/5/2025 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert J. White . Microsoft Teams link will be emailed to counsel. (KCas) |
|
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/28 1:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2025 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/28/2025 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2025 , Jury/Bench Trial set for 12/2/2025 . Signed by District Judge Robert J. White. (KCas) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 08/28 1:15 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Robert J. White: Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KCas) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appear*
Fri 08/23 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2024 11:30 AM before District Judge Robert J. White ***Microsoft Teams Link will be emailed to counsel*** (SOso) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
order
Text-Only Reassignment
Tue 08/13 9:07 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Brandy R. McMillion to District Judge Robert J. White pursuant to Administrative Order 24-AO-020. (SSch) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Mon 08/12 11:51 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (O'Shea, Kevin) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Mon 08/12 12:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference before Judge McMillion on 8/19/24 is Cancelled re5 Notice to Appear. Case will be reassigned and future dates will be issued by the new presiding judge. (LHos) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 08/06 12:20 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fortis Energy Services, Inc. (O'Shea, Kevin) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appear*
Mon 07/15 12:21 PM
ORDER TO ATTEND TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN: Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2024 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. Plan due 8/12/24. Please see order for call information. (LHos) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Mon 07/15 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Benton Moore on behalf of All Defendants. (Moore, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/15 10:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Huntington National Bank. (Behrendt, John) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Mon 07/15 10:00 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Huntington National Bank (Behrendt, John) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Huntington National Bank from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2024-206451-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9860653 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Behrendt, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 07/12 3:58 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch) |