McGlinchey v. CIOX Health, LLC.
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | Andrew S Harris |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00403 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:13 AM CDT |
Defendant
CIOX Health, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jana McGlinchey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 08/30 4:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) filed by CIOX Health, LLC. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/30 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) by CIOX Health, LLC. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/16 8:56 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. CIOX Health, LLC, answer due 8/30/2024. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on August 16, 2024. (DI) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/15 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by CIOX Health, LLC. (Hodges, Melissa) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/29 5:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jana McGlinchey. CIOX Health, LLC. served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (Watson, Louis) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Nicholas Norris on behalf of Jana McGlinchey (Norris, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/12 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to CIOX Health, LLC.. (cwl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against CIOX Health, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5448532), filed by Jana McGlinchey.(cwl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EECO Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |