Dennis v. Vorndam et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeremy D Kernodle |
Referred: | K Nicole Mitchell |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00247 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Brett Brewer
|
|
Defendant
Paul J Mascot
|
|
Defendant
Rodney Vorndam
|
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Michael Dennis
1102 Churchill Street
Jacksonville, TX 75766 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/21 12:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the United States Magistrate Judge re1 Complaint filed by Bobby Michael Dennis. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/21/2024. (gsm) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Tue 08/06 7:20 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Bobby Michael Dennis as to3 Order. (gsm) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Tue 07/30 11:46 AM
Letter from Bobby Dennis regarding a notice to vacate (gsm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/15 12:41 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER re1 Complaint filed by Bobby Michael Dennis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/15/2024. (gsm) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/15 10:04 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mitchell (gsm) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Mon 07/15 10:04 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (gsm) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/12 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bobby Michael Dennis.(gsm) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Correspondence, | ||
Att: 2 Jacksonville Municipal Court Information |