Michael's Used Cars, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Frank W Volk |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00346 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Wyoming County Circuit Court, CC-55-02024-C-39 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael's Used Cars, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer To Complaint Attached To Notice Of Removal
Fri 07/19 2:25 PM
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 7/19/2024 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mk) |
|
6 | 6
order
Judge Volk's Order and Notice
Fri 07/19 11:30 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 8/19/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/16/2024. Last day to file Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 9/23/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 04:00 PM on 10/7/2024, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 10/17/2024. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/21/2024. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 7/19/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Fri 07/12 3:30 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(McQuain, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Rule 7.1, FRCivP
Fri 07/12 3:29 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(McQuain, Elise) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service COS | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Fri 07/12 3:12 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (msa) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Of Failure to File Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/12 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. (msa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice Of Removal
Fri 07/12 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wyoming County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8691162. (msa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 07/15 8:29 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) |