BUTLER et al v. BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Sharon A King |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-07733 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 23:1441 Contract Real Estate |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Camden County Court, L-80-00024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:20 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
DANIEL R. WHITE REALTORS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
WILLIAM MCFETRIDGE
|
|
Cross Defendant
DANIEL R WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DANIEL R. WHITE REALTORS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM MCFETRIDGE
|
|
Defendant
DANIEL R WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENDAN W BUTLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SARAH K BUTLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/09 11:24 AM
NOTICE by BRENDAN W BUTLER, SARAH K BUTLER re14 Scheduling Order, Notice Re: Digital Discovery Conference (HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 09/04 12:41 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert D. Sokolove to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15635881.) (HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Thu 09/05 8:44 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT D. SOKOLOVE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (js) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/29 3:00 PM
ORDER Granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Sokolove, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/28/2024. (mag) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/28 10:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/28/2024 at 11:30 AM via Teams Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. A Teams invitation will be sent to counsel listed on the docket sheet. Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2024. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2025, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/27/2024. (lm) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 08/27 1:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/27/2024. Scheduling Order to be entered. (mb, ) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/26 3:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Robet D. Sokolove, Esquire re 11 Order,, by All Plaintiffs. (HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 08/21 10:42 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by BRENDAN W BUTLER, SARAH K BUTLER.(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 08/21 2:18 PM
TEXT ORDER: Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, the party filing its pro hac vice motion [ECF No. 4] shall file an amended certified statement of the applicant disclosing, for each bar in which the applicant is a member in good standing, the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members; or, in lieu thereof, the applicant may attach a certificate of good standing issued therefrom. See L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/21/24. (mb, ) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 08/12 10:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the August 6, 2024 letter [ECF No. 9] filed by Jennifer Hiller Nimeroff, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiffs; counsel are advised that the initial conference scheduled for August 27, 2024 will proceed as scheduled with all counsel who have entered appearances. If necessary, modifications to the scheduling order will be made once Defendant William McFetridge has been served and enters an appearance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/12/24. (mb, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Tue 08/06 2:30 PM
Letter from plaintiffs' counsel re Scheduling Conference re 7 Order,. (HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Fri 08/02 2:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL R. WHITE REALTORS LLC. (BURNLEY, TRACY) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Fri 08/02 7:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on August 27, 2024 at 11:00 shall be held VIA TEAMS VIDEO. A TEAMS invitation will be sent to counsel listed on the docket. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be filed on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/2/24. (mb, ) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)
Thu 08/01 2:30 PM
Order Initial Conference set for 8/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 08/01/2024. (aji, ) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Thu 08/01 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, Trial Counsel Designation , CROSSCLAIM against DANIEL R. WHITE REALTORS LLC, WILLIAM MCFETRIDGE, DANIEL R WHITE by BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS.(GILLESPIE, JOHN) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/19 12:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert D. Sokolove by BRENDAN W BUTLER, SARAH K BUTLER.(HILLER-NIMEROFF, JENNIFER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/19 2:59 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission of Robert D. Sokolove . Motion set for 8/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 07/17 9:28 AM
Clerk's Text Order - The document3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/2/2024. (dmr) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Tue 07/16 4:12 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Deft., Borough of Haddon Heights.. (GILLESPIE, JOHN) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 07/15 5:06 PM
Exhibit to QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS. (GILLESPIE, JOHN) |
|
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/15 11:32 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information; Plaintiff's Counsel from Superior Court Complaint was not added to the docket. Jury Demand; Incorrect Jury Demand selected. Please be sure to check both the Superior Court Complaint, and the Notice of Removal. Removal-Other Court Information; Format of State Court case number should appear as close to the original as possible . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2) |
||
qc
QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 11:32 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (sms2) |
||
qc
QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44
Mon 07/15 11:33 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2) |
||
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Mon 07/15 11:33 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (sms2) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS from Camden County, case number L-1780-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15513561), filed by BOROUGH OF HADDON HEIGHTS.(GILLESPIE, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/12 4:22 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, ) |