GARDNER v. COMBS et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Leo M Gordon |
Referred: | Jose R Almonte |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-07729 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, BERGEN COUNTY, BER L 003365 24 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
SEAN COMBS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AARON HALL
|
|
Defendant
UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Notice Only
PHV EDWARD B. DISKANT
|
|
Notice Only
PHV MAX J. KELLOGG
|
|
Notice Only
PHV LISA LINSKY
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ELIZABETH A. RODD
|
|
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL TREMONTE
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ERICA A. WOLFF
|
|
Plaintiff
LIZA GARDNER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/04 11:11 AM
Setting Hearing: Teams Video Status Conference set for 9/5/2024 at 1:30 PM before Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT). (nic, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 09/03 4:55 PM
Letter from Yonatan Y. Jacobs re35 Order,.(JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/31 2:18 PM
ORDER that Defendants' request is granted and that Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than 30 days after resolution of Plaintiff Liza Gardner's anticipated motion for remand, or by 9/25/2024, whichever date is later. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/31/2024. (wh) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 07/31 10:55 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERICA A. WOLFF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh) |
||
qc
QC - Pro Hac Vice request
Wed 07/31 10:59 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the34 Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel MICHAEL TREMONTE submitted by YONATAN Y. JACOBS on 7/30/2024 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh) |
||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 07/31 11:39 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL TREMONTE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. Kindly disregard the 7/31/2024 Clerk's Quality Control Message, as payment was processed but the filing system gave the filer problems while filing. (wh) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Tue 07/30 4:27 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Tremonte to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
33 | 33
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 07/30 4:07 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT): Teams Video Status Conference held on 7/30/2024. (Court Reporter, NONE) (nic, ) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Tue 07/30 3:41 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Erica A. Wolff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15554448.) (JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Tue 07/30 11:08 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, EDWARD B. DISKANT, ELIZABETH A. RODD, LISA LINSKY and MAX J. KELLOGG, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (wh) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Wed 07/31 11:33 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to MICHAEL TREMONTE: $ 250, receipt number ANJDC-15554561 (wh) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 07/29 3:35 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Max J. Kellogg to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15551203.) (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 07/29 3:32 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lisa Linsky to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15551191.) (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 07/29 3:30 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. Rodd to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15551173.) (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Mon 07/29 3:28 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward B. Diskant to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15551129.) (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 12:09 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of MAX J. KELLOGG. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 12:07 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of ELIZABETH A. RODD. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 12:05 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of LISA A. LINSKY. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 12:02 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of EDWARD B. DISKANT. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 11:59 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of MICHAEL TREMONTE. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 11:56 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of ERICA A. WOLFF. Signed by Judge Leo M Gordon on 7/29/2024. (wh) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 07/26 6:38 PM
Letter from Yonatan Y. Jacobs re 10 Text Order,,,,4 Letter.(JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Thu 07/25 11:27 AM
Exhibit to16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Thu 07/25 11:24 AM
Exhibit to15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Thu 07/25 11:22 AM
Exhibit to14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Thu 07/25 11:21 AM
Exhibit to13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
qc
QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney
Thu 07/25 9:13 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The13 ,14 ,15 , and16 Consent MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by JESSICA GREER GRIFFITH on 7/24/2024 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. These filings contain s/ signatures for Attorneys Edward B. Diskant, Lisa Linsky, Elizabeth Rodd, and Max J. Kellogg, applying for admission Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGES OF THEIR CERTIFICATIONS WITH PROPER WET/SCANNED SIGNATURES USING THE EVENT "EXHIBIT (TO DOCUMENT)", TYING THEM BACK INTO THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTIONS. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (wh) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/25 9:16 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max J. Kellogg,15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Rodd,14 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Linsky,13 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward B. Diskant. Motions set for 8/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 5:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Max J. Kellogg by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC..(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Jessica Greer Griffith, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Max Kellogg, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 5:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Rodd by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC..(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Jessica Greer Griffith, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Elizabeth Rodd, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 5:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Linsky by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC..(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Jessica Greer Griffith, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Lisa Linsky, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 4:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward B. Diskant by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC..(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Jessica Greer Griffith, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Edward B. Diskant, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/23 11:38 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Tremonte,11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erica A. Wolff. Motions set for 8/19/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/22 6:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Tremonte by SEAN COMBS.(JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Yonatan Y. Jacobs, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Michael Tremonte, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to the Certification of Michael Tremonte, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/22 6:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erica A. Wolff by SEAN COMBS.(JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Yonatan Y. Jacobs, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Erica A. Wolff, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to the Certification of Erica A. Wolff, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Text Order
Thu 07/18 7:50 PM
TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Defendants' request to extend the deadline for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to "thirty (30) days after resolution of Plaintiff's anticipated motion for remand or by September 25, 2024... whichever date is later." ECF No. 4. Per Defendants, Plaintiff has not yet indicated whether she consents to this request. ECF No. 4 at 2. Nor is the Court in receipt of a motion to remand by Plaintiff. Before issuing a decision on Defendants' request, the Court would like to consider Plaintiff's position. By no later than July 25, 2024, Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether she consents to Defendants' extension request at ECF No. 4 and, if so, whether Plaintiff will be filing a motion to remand. In the meantime, I will extend the deadline for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint through August 2, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 7/18/2024. (Almonte, Jose) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 3:47 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
qc
QC - Fillable PDF
Wed 07/17 12:08 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The8 Diversity Disclosure Statement filed by YONATAN JACOBS on 7/16/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (wh) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 4:03 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by SEAN COMBS. (JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 07/16 4:01 PM
Letter from Yonatan Y. Jacobs re1 Notice of Removal,,. (JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by YONATAN Y. JACOBS on behalf of SEAN COMBS (JACOBS, YONATAN) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/16 12:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Letter
Tue 07/16 12:32 PM
Letter from Jessica Greer Griffith.(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Correspondence with Mr. Blackburn, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Notice of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
qc
QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 9:10 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (wh) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/12 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA GREER GRIFFITH on behalf of UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Fri 07/12 1:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC. identifying Universal Music Group N.V. as Corporate Parent.. (GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/12 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, BERGEN COUNTY, case number BER L 003365 24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15513340), filed by UPTOWN RECORDS, MCA INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP.(GRIFFITH, JESSICA GREER) |
|
Att: 1 57 pgs Exhibit A: Complaint Summons and Case Information Statement, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B: Track Assignment Notice, | ||
Att: 3 9 pgs Exhibit C: General Correspondence and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/15 2:58 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leo M Gordon (CIT) and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, ) |